Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Tomczak

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Łódź

Titular Bishop of Sicca Veneria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1883BornBiesiekierz
7 Jan 190723.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 192744.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland
25 Feb 192744.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sicca Veneria
3 Apr 192744.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sicca Veneria
21 Oct 196784.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Tomczak:
Bishop Kazimierz Tomczak (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Łódź

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013