Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karol Niemira

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pinsk

Titular Bishop of Tavium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1883BornWarszawa
13 Nov 191128.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 193349.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pinsk, Belarus
26 May 193349.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tavium
15 Aug 193349.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tavium
6 May 194662.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Pinsk, Belarus
8 Jul 196581.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pinsk, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Karol Niemira:
Bishop Karol Niemira (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pinsk

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015