Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduard Baron von der Ropp

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1851BornLiksna
26 Jul 188634.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mohilev, Belarus
2 Aug 188634.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mohilev, Belarus
9 Jun 190250.5AppointedBishop of Tiraspol, Moldova
16 Nov 190250.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tiraspol, Moldova
9 Nov 190351.9AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
2 Dec 190352.0InstalledBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
25 Jul 191765.6AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
25 Jul 193987.6DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Eduard Baron von der Ropp:
Archbishop Eduard Baron von der Ropp (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,370
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 556
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013