Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karol Antoni Niedziałkowski

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1846BornMińkowce
23 Jan 186922.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Aug 189751.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus
2 Aug 189751.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
5 Dec 189751.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samos
15 Apr 190154.9AppointedBishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
7 Apr 191164.9DiedBishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Karol Antoni Niedziałkowski:
Bishop Karol Antoni Niedziałkowski (born , died ) Bishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec)

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,804
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 351, and Page 497
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013