Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petras Pranciskus Bučys, M.I.C. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary

Titular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1872BornŠilgaliai, Lithuania
25 Mar 189926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mohilev, Belarus
15 Sep 191038.0ProfessedPriest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
11 Jun 191744.8Professed (Perpetual Vows)Priest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
27 Jul 192754.9AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
3 Jul 193057.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
6 Jul 193057.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
21 Jul 193360.9ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
22 Jul 193966.9AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
14 May 195178.7ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
25 Oct 195179.1DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary

MicroData Summary for Petras Pranciskus Bučys
Bishop Petras Pranciskus Bučys M.I.C. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 42
  • opd/c1: CB, 19 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Jun 2016