Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Maximos III Michel Mazloum

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1779³BornAlep
15 Apr 180626.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jul 181030.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria dei Greco-Melkiti
6 Aug 181030.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria dei Greco-Melkiti
17 Dec 181637.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
29 Apr 181737.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
24 Mar 183353.3SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
24 Mar 183353.3SelectedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
1 Feb 183656.2ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
1 Feb 183656.2ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
11 Aug 185575.7DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maximos III Michel Mazloum (VIAF: 283116805)
Patriarch Maximos III Michel Mazloum (born Nov 1779, died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1810, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 56, and Page 80
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016