Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregorio (Michael) Ata (Atta)

Deceased

Archbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1815Born
1837²21.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 184832.8AppointedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria
20 Feb 184933.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria
3 Dec 189984.6DiedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio (Michael) Ata (Atta) (VIAF: 168511446)
Archbishop Gregorio (Michael) Ata (Atta) (born , died ) Archbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZahle
Ordained BishopMelkite Cathedral, Damas, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek)

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 50.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017