Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambroise Abdo (Abdou)

Deceased

Patriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1820Born
1860¹39.9AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
1 Apr 186040.2Ordained BishopPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
1864¹43.9AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)
15 Nov 186646.8AppointedBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
24 Dec 187555.9AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
1876²55.9DiedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambroise Abdo (Abdou)
Bishop Ambroise Abdo (Abdou) (born , died 1876) Patriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017