Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abraham Agabio (Agapios) Bsciai (Bishai)

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

Titular Bishop of Chariopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1831Born
25 Mar 185624.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 186634.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
27 Feb 186634.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Chariopolis
15 Apr 186635.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chariopolis
1878²46.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
20 Feb 188755.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Abraham Agabio (Agapios) Bsciai (Bishai) (VIAF: 315558431)
Bishop Abraham Agabio (Agapios) Bsciai (Bishai) (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHammas
Ordained BishopGrand Convent, Cairo

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,792
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1866, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017