Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paškal Vujičić (Vujcic), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia

Titular Bishop of Antiphellus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1826³Born
1 Jun 185832.1AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
25 Jul 185832.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pult, Albania
7 Sep 186034.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of
7 Sep 186034.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt
7 Sep 186034.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
6 Aug 186640.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
17 Mar 188861.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paškal Vujičić (Vujcic) (VIAF: 305515018)
Bishop Paškal Vujičić (Vujcic) O.F.M. Obs. (born Apr 1826, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Bosna)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceImoski
Ordained BishopVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 111, and Page 472
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1858, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017