Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Renier

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1796Born
5 Jun 181923.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 185559.6SelectedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
17 Dec 185559.8ConfirmedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
30 Mar 185660.1Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
12 Apr 187175.2DiedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Renier (VIAF: 89033969)
Bishop Giovanni Renier (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno e Feltre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastello di Godego, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ceneda, Diocese of Ceneda

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017