Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Gava

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belluno e Feltre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1795BornSan Giacomo di Veglia
19 Sep 181823.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Sep 184247.2SelectedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
22 Jun 184347.9ConfirmedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
25 Jun 184347.9Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
3 Nov 185257.3ResignedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
14 Mar 186569.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Belluno e Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Gava
Bishop Antonio Gava (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belluno e Feltre

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1843, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016