Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Maria Zinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1805Born
22 Sep 182722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Dec 182722.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Aug 186156.1SelectedBishop of Treviso, Italy
30 Sep 186156.2ConfirmedBishop of Treviso, Italy
9 Feb 186256.6Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
24 Nov 187974.4DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Maria Zinelli (VIAF: 61465222)
Bishop Federico Maria Zinelli (born , died ) Bishop of Treviso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia
Ordained BishopUdine, Archdiocese of Udine

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 537
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,646
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017