Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuele Kaubeck

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1820Born
27 Sep 184626.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187151.4AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
30 Nov 187151.5Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
31 Aug 187757.2DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emmanuele Kaubeck
Bishop Emmanuele Kaubeck (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacarscka
Ordained BishopPadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017