Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Manfredini

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1792BornRovigo
24 Sep 181422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Apr 181522.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 184249.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
8 Jan 184350.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Famagusta
21 Jan 185764.4SelectedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
19 Mar 185764.6ConfirmedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
17 Aug 188290.0DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Manfredini:
Bishop Federico Manfredini (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 443
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 191

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 23 Nov 2014