Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Giovanni Antonio Farina

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1803BornGambellara
14 Jan 182724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
25 May 185047.4SelectedBishop of Treviso, Italy
30 Sep 185047.7ConfirmedBishop of Treviso, Italy
19 Jan 185148.0Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
18 Jun 186057.4SelectedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
28 Sep 186057.7ConfirmedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
4 Mar 188885.1DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
4 Nov 2001Beatified
23 Nov 2014Canonized

MicroData Summary for Bl. Giovanni Antonio Farina:
Bishop Bl. Giovanni Antonio Farina (born , died ) Bishop of Vicenza

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,534
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 537, and Page 589
  • cano: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Jun 2014