Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Benzon

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1817Born
17 May 184527.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 184528.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 185841.0AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
24 Feb 185941.4Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
10 Dec 186649.2DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Benzon (VIAF: 88693434)
Bishop Camillo Benzon (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSte Marie du Salut, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 20.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 77
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1859, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017