Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo De’ Foretti

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1783Born
21 Dec 180522.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 May 180622.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 184158.0SelectedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
24 Jan 184258.5ConfirmedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
8 Jan 184359.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
25 Apr 186783.7DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo De’ Foretti
Bishop Giacomo De’ Foretti (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadova

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017