Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Legat

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1807BornNiclas
17 Sep 183023.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Sep 183023.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 184639.1SelectedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy
21 Dec 184639.3ConfirmedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy
11 Apr 184739.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy
12 Feb 187567.5DiedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Legat:
Bishop Bartolomeo Legat (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper)

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 541

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013