Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juraj (Giorgio) Dobrila

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1812BornJeženj
9 Sep 183725.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Sep 183725.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Oct 185745.5SelectedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
21 Dec 185745.7ConfirmedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
2 May 185846.0Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
29 May 187563.1SelectedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy
5 Jul 187563.2ConfirmedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy
13 Jan 188269.7DiedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy

MicroData Summary for Juraj (Giorgio) Dobrila:
Bishop Juraj (Giorgio) Dobrila (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper)

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 440, and Page 541

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013