Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Josip Vitezić

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1806Born
9 Aug 182922.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Sep 182923.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 185448.2SelectedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
23 Mar 185548.5ConfirmedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
9 Sep 185549.0Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
4 Sep 187771.0DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ivan Josip Vitezić
Bishop Ivan Josip Vitezić (born , died ) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVrbnik, Diocese of Krk (Veglia)

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 583
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017