Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jacopo Cardinal Monico

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1776BornRiese
21 Mar 180124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
22 Feb 182245.6SelectedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
16 May 182346.8ConfirmedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
9 Nov 182347.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
23 Nov 182347.4InstalledBishop of Ceneda, Italy
9 Nov 182650.3SelectedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
9 Apr 182750.7ConfirmedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
8 Sep 182751.2InstalledPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
29 Jul 183357.0Elevated to Cardinal
23 Jun 183457.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
25 Apr 185174.8DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Jacopo Monico
Jacopo Cardinal Monico (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
  • a cardinal for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 144, and Page 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 40
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Jul 1833

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016