Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Savorin

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1769Born
10 Jun 179222.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 182960.4SelectedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
15 Mar 183060.7ConfirmedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
8 Aug 183061.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
11 Sep 183061.2InstalledBishop of Chioggia, Italy
25 Dec 184071.4DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Savorin (VIAF: 89389063)
Bishop Antonio Savorin (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorreglia

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 27
  • bd/bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018