Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Soldati

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1780BornPadova
18 Sep 180222.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Mar 180322.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Oct 182848.2SelectedBishop of Treviso, Italy
18 May 182948.8ConfirmedBishop of Treviso, Italy
27 Sep 182949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
10 Dec 184969.4DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Soldati:
Bishop Sebastiano Soldati (born , died ) Bishop of Treviso

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,528
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013