Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Pio Ravasi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Adria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1766BornCrema
27 Feb 179024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Jun 182054.3SelectedBishop of Adria, Italy
8 Jan 182154.9ConfirmedBishop of Adria, Italy
21 Jul 182155.4Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
2 Oct 183367.6DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Pio Ravasi:
Bishop Carlo Pio Ravasi O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,922
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 59
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013