Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Grasser

Deceased

Bishop of Verona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1782BornGlurns
14 Dec 180624.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 182239.3SelectedBishop of Treviso, Italy
2 Dec 182239.9ConfirmedBishop of Treviso, Italy
16 Mar 182340.2Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
15 Feb 182845.1SelectedBishop of Verona, Italy
15 Dec 182846.0ConfirmedBishop of Verona, Italy
25 Mar 182946.3InstalledBishop of Verona, Italy
22 Nov 183956.9DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Grasser:
Bishop Giuseppe Grasser (born , died ) Bishop of Verona

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 360, and Page 394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 16 May 2015