Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Domenico Ferrari

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1769BornBrescia
21 Dec 179324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Jul 180737.5IncardinatedPriest of Brescia, Italy
2 Jun 183363.4SelectedBishop of Brescia, Italy
20 Jan 183464.1ConfirmedBishop of Brescia, Italy
11 May 183464.4Ordained BishopBishop of Brescia, Italy
29 Nov 184676.9DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Domenico Ferrari
Bishop Carlo Domenico Ferrari (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,530
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Aug 2016