Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Gritti Morlacchi

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1777Born
30 May 180123.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 183052.2SelectedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
28 Feb 183153.1ConfirmedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
6 Mar 183153.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
17 Dec 185274.9DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Gritti Morlacchi (VIAF: 89251122)
Bishop Carlo Gritti Morlacchi (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlzano Maggiore

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016