Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Benaglia

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1768BornBergamo
19 Dec 179022.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 179122.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 183768.8SelectedBishop of Lodi, Italy
2 Oct 183768.9ConfirmedBishop of Lodi, Italy
13 Jun 186899.6DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Benaglia:
Bishop Gaetano Benaglia (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

  • a priest for 76.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013