Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Alcántara Jiménez, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Montevideo, Uruguay

Titular Bishop of Cinna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1782Born
30 Dec 180624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
19 Oct 183047.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Montevideo, Uruguay
19 Oct 183047.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cinna
30 Nov 183048.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cinna
21 Feb 184360.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Montevideo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Pedro Alcántara Jiménez
Bishop Pedro Alcántara Jiménez O. Praem. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Montevideo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCantalapiedra, Spain

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 151
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 147, Number 801
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast