Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Modesto Farina

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1771BornLugano
19 Apr 179423.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 182049.7SelectedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
13 Aug 182150.4ConfirmedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
15 Aug 182150.4Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
10 May 185685.1DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Modesto Farina:
Bishop Modesto Farina (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 300

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013