Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Fusinato

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1802Born
18 Mar 182522.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Padova {Padua}, Italy
23 Sep 182624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
11 Nov 184947.5SelectedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
20 May 185048.1ConfirmedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
16 Feb 185148.8Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
28 Jul 185452.3DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Fusinato
Bishop Angelo Fusinato (born , died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArsiè
Ordained BishopPadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,845
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 221
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018