Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Fontanini, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1766BornLatisana
23 Apr 179124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
15 May 182659.8SelectedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
9 Apr 182760.7ConfirmedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
2 Sep 182761.1Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
1 Nov 184882.2DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Fontanini (VIAF: 62404172)
Bishop Carlo Fontanini C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016