Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Sartori Canova

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Myndus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1775BornCrespano del Grappa, Italy
3 Jul 182650.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Myndus
26 Nov 182651.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myndus
18 Jul 185882.9DiedTitular Bishop of Myndus

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Sartori Canova (VIAF: 261092)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Sartori Canova (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Myndus

  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1826, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Aug 2016