Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Trama

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Calvi e Teano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1790BornNapoli
23 Sep 181525.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 183343.3SelectedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
20 Jan 183443.6ConfirmedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
26 Jan 183443.6Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
6 Oct 183747.3ResignedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
1846¹55.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Calvi e Teano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Trama:
Bishop Giuseppe Trama (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Calvi e Teano

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013