Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Scialdone

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Capua

Titular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1781BornVitulazio
21 Dec 180524.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 183957.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Capua, Italy
11 Jul 183957.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina
4 Aug 183958.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina
6 Sep 186281.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Scialdone:
Bishop Alessandro Scialdone (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Capua

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,090
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013