Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Giudice Caracciolo, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1785BornNapoli
1802²16.7ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
18 Mar 180923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
2 Feb 182034.8SelectedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
21 Feb 182034.9ConfirmedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
27 Feb 182034.9Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta, Italy
8 Mar 183347.9SelectedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
15 Apr 183348.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
29 Jul 183348.3Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 183348.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
29 Jan 184458.8DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Giudice Caracciolo (VIAF: 89063974)
Filippo Cardinal Giudice Caracciolo C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
  • a cardinal for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Jul 1833
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 262, and Page 278
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016