Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Maria della Torre

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1746BornCapo di Monte
25 May 177124.5Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 179245.4AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
9 Apr 179245.4Ordained BishopBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
18 Dec 179751.1AppointedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
14 Jun 181871.6SelectedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
21 Dec 181872.1ConfirmedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
28 May 182073.6DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Maria della Torre:
Bishop Bernardo Maria della Torre (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 141
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014