Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marino Paglia

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1781³Born
21 Dec 180524.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 183453.0SelectedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
6 Apr 183553.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
26 Apr 183553.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
5 Sep 185775.8DiedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marino Paglia (VIAF: 304918503)
Archbishop Marino Paglia (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSternatia

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 330
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018