Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Bruni, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1802BornBisceglia
18 Sep 182422.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Mission
2 Apr 182522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
29 Mar 183734.7SelectedBishop of Ugento, Italy
19 May 183734.9ConfirmedBishop of Ugento, Italy
4 Jun 183734.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
17 Jan 186360.5DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bruni:
Bishop Francesco Bruni C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ugento

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 383
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,637

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013