Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Cinque

Deceased

Bishop of Anglona-Tursi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1767BornMorano
24 Sep 179124.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 183769.7SelectedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
19 May 183769.9ConfirmedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
19 Nov 183770.4Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
28 Nov 184174.4DiedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Cinque:
Bishop Antonio Cinque (born , died ) Bishop of Anglona-Tursi

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1842
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013