Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Camillo Giovanni Rossi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Severo

Titular Archbishop of Damascus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1767³BornAvellino
6 Jun 178922.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Feb 179022.8Ordained PriestPriest
Jun 1805³38.1SelectedBishop of Marsi, Italy
26 Jun 180538.2ConfirmedBishop of Marsi, Italy
30 Jun 180538.2Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
22 May 181851.1SelectedBishop of San Severo, Italy
26 Jun 181851.2ConfirmedBishop of San Severo, Italy
9 Apr 182760.0ResignedBishop of San Severo, Italy
9 Apr 182760.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
16 Jul 183770.2DiedBishop Emeritus of San Severo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Giovanni Rossi:
Archbishop Camillo Giovanni Rossi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Severo

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 172, and Page 254
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 343

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013