Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Candido Maria Frattini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1767BornRome, Italy
5 Jun 179123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
26 Sep 181447.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
2 Oct 181447.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
29 Sep 182154.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Philippi

MicroData Summary for Candido Maria Frattini:
Archbishop Candido Maria Frattini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Philippi

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 306

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014