Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Filesio Cittadini

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1768BornTerni
18 Jun 179122.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 181850.1AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
4 Oct 181850.1Ordained BishopBishop of Perugia, Italy
16 Apr 184576.6DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Filesio Cittadini
Bishop Carlo Filesio Cittadini (born , died ) Bishop of Perugia

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 303
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016