Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Paolo Mazzichi

Deceased

Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1756BornAssisi
20 May 178023.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 181760.6AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
4 May 181760.6Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
9 May 182366.7DiedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo Mazzichi:
Bishop Pietro Paolo Mazzichi (born , died ) Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 12
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015