Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Ricciardone

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1758BornChieti
22 Dec 178123.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181859.3SelectedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
25 May 181859.4ConfirmedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
31 May 181859.4Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
24 Jul 184586.6DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Ricciardone:
Bishop Domenico Ricciardone (born , died ) Bishop of Penne e Atri

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 446
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 302

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013