Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Pescara-Penne

Archidioecesis Piscariensis-Pinnensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Tommaso Valentinetti, Archbishop
  • Francesco Cuccarese, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 2 March 1982
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,600 (618 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Abruzzo-Molise
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesipescara.it/
  • Mailing Address: Piazza dello Spirito Santo 5, 65122 Pescara, Italia
  • Telephone: 085.422.25.71/2
  • Fax: 085.421.31.49

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Penne
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Penne (erected)
Diocese of Penne e Atri
15 March 1252UnitedDiocese of Atri
Diocese of Penne
Diocese of Penne e Atri
1 July 1949UnitedDiocese of Penne e Atri
Diocese of Teramo
Diocese of Teramo e Atri
Diocese of Penne e Pescara
1 July 1949SplitDiocese of Penne e Atri Diocese of Penne e Pescara
Archdiocese of Pescara-Penne
2 March 1982Name ChangedDiocese of Penne e Pescara Archdiocese of Pescara-Penne

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Penne e Pescara
1950234,500235,00099.8%102691711,3716915071ap1951
1970270,000270,50099.8%115501651,63660440103ap1971
1980255,300255,90099.8%131281591,605136426120ap1981
Archdiocese of Pescara-Penne
1990274,400275,60099.6%138672051,338785402139ap1991
1999292,680298,68098.0%139672061,4201476395126ap2000
2000292,000298,00098.0%147652121,3771572403126ap2001
2001292,000298,00098.0%143652081,4031572398126ap2002
2002292,000298,00098.0%140652051,4241572398126ap2003
2003292,000298,00098.0%136652011,4521672398126ap2004
2004292,000298,00098.0%132651971,4821672398126ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 Jun 2013