Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Calcagnini

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1717BornGaeta
22 Sep 174225.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 177962.2AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
18 Jul 177962.2Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
179779.7DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Calcagnini:
Bishop Bonaventura Calcagnini (born ) Bishop of Penne e Atri

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 332

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013