Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria de Leone

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1712BornMola
24 Sep 173522.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 176249.3AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
31 Jan 176249.3Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
7 Apr 177966.5DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria de Leone:
Bishop Giuseppe Maria de Leone (born , died ) Bishop of Penne e Atri

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013