Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedetto Falcucci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Penne e Pescara, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Preslavus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1905Born
3 Mar 192822.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 194540.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chieti, Italy
22 Dec 194540.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
11 Feb 194640.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
2 Jul 194943.8AppointedBishop of Penne e Pescara, Italy
1 Jan 195953.3ResignedBishop of Penne e Pescara, Italy
1 Jan 195953.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Preslavus
7 Jul 197771.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Penne e Pescara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Falcucci
Archbishop Benedetto Falcucci (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Penne e Pescara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtessa

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast